MN HF4311 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Legacy Finance Division
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Legacy Finance Division
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Agriculture, Pollution Control Agency, Board of Water and Soil Resources, Department of Health, Metropolitan Council, and University of Minnesota money appropriated from clean water fund.
Title
Department of Agriculture, Pollution Control Agency, Board of Water and Soil Resources, Department of Health, Metropolitan Council, and University of Minnesota money appropriated from clean water fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Legacy Finance Division |
2020-03-12 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4365 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance