MN HF4240 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act modified.
Title
Minnesota Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-04-30 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF4273 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy