MN HF4239 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Author added Mekeland
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Author added Mekeland
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Patient or resident right to have support person present while receiving care or service established.
Title
Patient or resident right to have support person present while receiving care or service established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2022-04-19 | House | Author added Garofalo |
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Poston and Haley |
2022-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |