MN HF4224 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native American women victims of trauma assistance funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Native American women victims of trauma assistance funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Christensen |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3864 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy