MN HF4221 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hennepin Board of County Commissioners permitted to set reasonable allowances for expenses or a per diem allowance for members of boards or agencies.
Title
Hennepin Board of County Commissioners permitted to set reasonable allowances for expenses or a per diem allowance for members of boards or agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 87 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 87 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 71 | |
2022-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-18 | House | Returned from Senate |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF4050 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF4050, now on General Orders |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-05-09 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-05-09 | House | Third reading |
2022-05-05 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 9, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-03-23 | House | Division action, return to State Government Finance and Elections |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Youakim |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred by Chair to Local Government Division |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF4050 (Similar To) 2022-05-11 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4221