MN HF4219 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Driving under the influence provision uniform enforcement for recreational vehicles provided, and criminal penalties provided.
Title
Driving under the influence provision uniform enforcement for recreational vehicles provided, and criminal penalties provided.
Sponsors
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Paul Novotny [R] |
Rep. Anne Neu Brindley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-30 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2020-03-26 | House | Author added Neu |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3770 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy