MN HF4208 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Statutory immunization requirement exemption provided for sincerely held religious belief.
Title
Statutory immunization requirement exemption provided for sincerely held religious belief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2020-03-09 | House | Authors added Bahr and Poston |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3814 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Author added Housley