MN HF4201 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State auditor funding for school finance accountability team provided, work billing exempted until July 1, 2024; and money appropriated.
Title
State auditor funding for school finance accountability team provided, work billing exempted until July 1, 2024; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Sandell [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Education Policy |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3933 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections