MN HF4200 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-03 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Continued publication of annual adverse health event report required, retaliation against patient care staff prohibited, and enforcement provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continued publication of annual adverse health event report required, retaliation against patient care staff prohibited, and enforcement provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-03HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2024-04-11HouseAuthor added Kraft
2024-03-14HouseAuthor added Kozlowski
2024-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2024-03-11HouseAuthor added Pérez-Vega
2024-03-07HouseAuthors added Huot; Curran; Freiberg; Hansen, R.
2024-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy
2024-02-29HouseAuthor added Virnig
2024-02-28HouseAuthors added Long; Bahner; Elkins
2024-02-26HouseAuthor added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
2024-02-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF4444 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Author added Pha

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback