MN HF4198 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Counties provided grants for education, jobs, and workforce development; Community Career Workforce Academies established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Counties provided grants for education, jobs, and workforce development; Community Career Workforce Academies established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2022-03-23 | House | Authors added McDonald and Kiel |
2022-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance and Policy |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Pelowski |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3930 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy