MN HF418 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Division action, return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal sexual conduct statutory reform working group created, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal sexual conduct statutory reform working group created, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-02-07HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-01-31HouseAuthors added Tabke, Mahoney
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF2157 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Author added Draheim

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback