MN HF416 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extended jurisdiction juvenile conviction statistic report required, eligibility established for release for individuals sentenced to life in prison for crimes committed while under the age of 18, eligibility established for early supervised release for individuals sentenced for crimes committed while under the age 18, Juvenile Release Board established, and court of appeals review provided.
Title
Extended jurisdiction juvenile conviction statistic report required, eligibility established for release for individuals sentenced to life in prison for crimes committed while under the age of 18, eligibility established for early supervised release for individuals sentenced for crimes committed while under the age 18, Juvenile Release Board established, and court of appeals review provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Lillie |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Frazier |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF900 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy