MN HF4146 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substance Use Disorder Task Force on Maternal Health established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Substance Use Disorder Task Force on Maternal Health established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Author added Hollins |
2022-04-21 | House | Author added Moran |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4046 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Chief author added Rosen