MN HF4137 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Intent required for repeated harassing conduct crime.
Title
Intent required for repeated harassing conduct crime.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Secretary of State Chapter 96 | |
2020-05-18 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-18 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-18 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-12 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-12 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 12, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-05 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4065 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy