MN HF4134 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Association of Workforce Boards funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Association of Workforce Boards funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Theis |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Lislegard |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4160 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Author added Eken