MN HF4065 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Secretary of State Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Secretary of State Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health Department, health care, health-related licensing boards, health insurance, community supports, behavioral health, continuing care for older adults, child and vulnerable adult protection, economic assistance, direct care and treatment, preventing homelessness, human services licensing and operations, the Minnesota rare Disease Advisory Council, nonintoxicating hemp regulation, organ donation regulation, mandated reports, and long-term care consultation services governing provisions modified; forecast adjustments made; reports required; and money appropriated.
Title
Health Department, health care, health-related licensing boards, health insurance, community supports, behavioral health, continuing care for older adults, child and vulnerable adult protection, economic assistance, direct care and treatment, preventing homelessness, human services licensing and operations, the Minnesota rare Disease Advisory Council, nonintoxicating hemp regulation, organ donation regulation, mandated reports, and long-term care consultation services governing provisions modified; forecast adjustments made; reports required; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-22 - House - House: H.F. NO. 4065 (Y: 68 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Secretary of State Chapter 98 | |
2022-06-02 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-06-02 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-06-02 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-22 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2022-05-22 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2022-05-22 | House | Motion prevailed |
2022-05-22 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2022-05-22 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2022-05-22 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-22 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF3816 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3816, now on General Orders |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-04-04 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-04-04 | House | Amended |
2022-03-31 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3816 (Similar To) 2022-04-06 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4065