MN HF406 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Carbon monoxide alarm requirements modified for hotels and lodging houses, and safety warning for violation required.
Title
Carbon monoxide alarm requirements modified for hotels and lodging houses, and safety warning for violation required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Second reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2023-01-30 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-01-26 | House | Authors added Curran and Clardy |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF225 (Similar To) 2023-03-07 - Second reading