MN HF4026 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Boe
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Boe
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Duty disability determination timeline modified, treatment required as park of workers' compensation benefits required, peace officer and firefighter preservice and in-service wellness training required, and money appropriated.
Title
Duty disability determination timeline modified, treatment required as park of workers' compensation benefits required, peace officer and firefighter preservice and in-service wellness training required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Patricia Mueller [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Poston |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3943 (Similar To) 2022-03-16 - Author stricken Bigham