MN HF40 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Civil right to vote of an individual restored upon release from incarceration or upon sentencing if no incarceration is imposed, and notice required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil right to vote of an individual restored upon release from incarceration or upon sentencing if no incarceration is imposed, and notice required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseSecond reading
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-03-06HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-13HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Government Operations
2019-01-22HouseAuthors added Elkins and Cantrell
2019-01-19HouseReferred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
2019-01-17HouseAuthors added Hamilton, Baker, Garofalo, Stephenson, Loeffler and Mahoney
2019-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF856 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Author added Cohen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback