MN HF3991 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Restorative practices restitution program created, ability of court to order fine in delinquency proceeding or juvenile major water or traffic offender proceeding eliminated, and conforming and technical changes made.
Title
Restorative practices restitution program created, ability of court to order fine in delinquency proceeding or juvenile major water or traffic offender proceeding eliminated, and conforming and technical changes made.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Josiah Hill [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Liz Lee [D] |
Rep. Samantha Sencer-Mura [D] | Rep. Andrew Smith [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] | Rep. Brion Curran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-02-22 | House | Author added Pursell |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF3987 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Author added Oumou Verbeten