MN HF3976 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Aiding and abetting felony murder sentencing task force established, and report required.
Title
Aiding and abetting felony murder sentencing task force established, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-30 | House | Author added Koznick |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Albright |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3802 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy