MN HF3973 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added Lee.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota African American Family Preservation Act established, African American Child Welfare Oversight Council created, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota African American Family Preservation Act established, African American Child Welfare Oversight Council created, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseAuthor added Lee.
2018-04-12HouseAuthors added Hornstein, Flanagan, and Dehn, R.
2018-03-26HouseAuthors added Maye Quade, Bly
2018-03-22HouseAuthors added Hamilton and Omar.
2018-03-19HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF3779 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback