MN HF3958 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Seizure detection device medical assistance coverage required.
Title
Seizure detection device medical assistance coverage required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Bierman |
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Hausman |
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Hornstein |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Youakim |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Stephenson, Long, Vang, Acomb, Carlson, Boldon, Lee, Franke, Feist, Anderson and Moller |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3688 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy