MN HF3955 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Private detective license requirements modified.
Title
Private detective license requirements modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3749 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3749, now on General Orders |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-05-18 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-05-18 | House | Third reading |
2022-05-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 18, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3749 (Similar To) 2022-05-20 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3955