MN HF3950 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Author added Mariani
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Author added Mariani
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ramsey County; families experiencing homelessness funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Ramsey County; families experiencing homelessness funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Author added Mariani |
2022-04-28 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2022-04-27 | House | Author added Xiong, T. |
2022-04-24 | House | Author added Her |
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Albright |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Thompson |
2022-03-09 | House | Division action, return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-03-07 | House | Authors added Hollins, Moller, Bernardy, Becker-Finn, Fischer, Wazlawik, Feist, Howard, Reyer |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventing Homelessness Division |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3710 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Author added Abeler