MN HF3926 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher preparation time modified.
Title
Teacher preparation time modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Keeler [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Liz Reyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Reyer |
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Davids |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Christensen |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Feist |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4067 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Author added Abeler