MN HF3908 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ethiopian Community Center funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Ethiopian Community Center funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Author added Huot |
2022-04-24 | House | Authors added Reyer, Feist |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3886 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Authors added Clausen; Kunesh