MN HF3892 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Women exempted from MinnesotaCare premiums, and human services commissioner required to provide recommendations on ensuring continuous health coverage for women transitioning from medical assistance postpartum coverage.
Title
Women exempted from MinnesotaCare premiums, and human services commissioner required to provide recommendations on ensuring continuous health coverage for women transitioning from medical assistance postpartum coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2020-03-04 | House | Authors added Huot and Mann |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3853 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy