MN HF3886 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Universal, voluntary home visiting program for families with infants established, and money appropriated.
Title
Universal, voluntary home visiting program for families with infants established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Author added Moran |
2022-04-04 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Boldon |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Bahner |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3766 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders