MN HF3881 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-21 - Author added Petersburg
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-21 - Author added Petersburg
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sexually explicit material involving children creation, possession, or distribution penalties increased.
Title
Sexually explicit material involving children creation, possession, or distribution penalties increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-21 | House | Author added Petersburg |
2022-05-16 | House | Author added Novotny |
2022-05-12 | House | Author added Edelson |
2022-04-07 | House | Authors added Boe and Haley |
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Olson, B. |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Lucero |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Akland and Burkel |
2022-03-07 | House | Authors added Dettmer, Daniels, Poston, Drazkowski, Neu Brindley, and Backer |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3894 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Author added Dornink