MN HF387 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
K-12 education expense subtraction and credit modified, credit extended to tuition, subtraction and credit amounts increased, income phaseout increased, and credit adjusted for inflation.
Title
K-12 education expense subtraction and credit modified, credit extended to tuition, subtraction and credit amounts increased, income phaseout increased, and credit adjusted for inflation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-02 | House | Author added Loonan. |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2017-01-30 | House | Author added Scott. |
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Howe. |
2017-01-26 | House | Author stricken Davids. |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |