MN HF3849 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent enrollment teacher training funding increased, concurrent enrollment aid modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Concurrent enrollment teacher training funding increased, concurrent enrollment aid modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] |
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance Division |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance Division |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Lien |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4257 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy