MN HF3848 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Sauke.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Sauke.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nurse Licensure Compact created, and money appropriated.
Title
Nurse Licensure Compact created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Sauke. |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Author added Pierson. |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3305 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy