MN HF3811 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added Pugh.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added Pugh.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individual income tax rates reduced.
Title
Individual income tax rates reduced.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added Munson; Bahr, C.; and Wills. |
2018-03-22 | House | Author added Lucero. |
2018-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3371 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Referred to Taxes