MN HF3805 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Capitol Area Security Advisory Committee sunset date extended.
Title
Capitol Area Security Advisory Committee sunset date extended.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3805 (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 115 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 115 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 73 | |
2022-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-18 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2022-05-18 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2022-05-18 | House | Motion prevailed |
2022-05-18 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-05-17 | House | House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF3041 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3041, now on General Orders |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-05-06 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-05-06 | House | Third reading |
2022-05-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 6, 2022 |
2022-04-07 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-03-24 | House | Motion prevailed |
2022-03-24 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2022-03-17 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State Government Finance and Elections |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3041 (Similar To) 2022-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3805