MN HF3804 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Itasca County; unorganized territory addition to Harris Township permitted, notwithstanding the petition requirement.
Title
Itasca County; unorganized territory addition to Harris Township permitted, notwithstanding the petition requirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-05-15 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3745 |
2020-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-11 | House | Returned by Chair to Government Operations |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF3745 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed