MN HF380 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance and Policy
Pending: House Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance and Policy
Pending: House Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Career and technical education teacher training pilot project created, and money appropriated.
Title
Career and technical education teacher training pilot project created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Steve Sandell [D] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance and Policy |
2021-03-18 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Kiel |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Haley |
2021-02-01 | House | Authors added Albright and Sandell |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF577 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy