MN HF38 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - House: Author added Bunn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - House: Author added Bunn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Location equity index created, general education revenue formula modified, and revenue for some school districts increased.
Title
Location equity index created, general education revenue formula modified, and revenue for some school districts increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] | Rep. John Benson [D] | Rep. Julie Bunn [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
Rep. Mindy Greiling [D] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Katherine Knuth [D] | Rep. Will Morgan [D] |
Rep. Joe Mullery [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Maria Ruud [D] | Sen. Bev Scalze [D] |
Rep. Steve Simon [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-02 | House: Author added Bunn | |
2009-01-22 | House: Author added Scalze | |
2009-01-15 | House: Authors added Mullery; Hilstrom; Anderson, S.; Morgan and Nelson | |
2009-01-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2009-01-12 | House: Referred by Chair to K-12 Education Finance Division |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0038&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0038.0.pdf |