MN HF3783 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-24 - Author added Kraft
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tax-forfeited land that includes land within boundary of Indian reservation required to be offered to affected bands before being offered for sale to other parties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax-forfeited land that includes land within boundary of Indian reservation required to be offered to affected bands before being offered for sale to other parties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-24HouseAuthor added Kraft
2024-04-04HouseAuthor added Gomez
2024-03-14HouseAuthor added Hanson, J.
2024-03-13HouseAuthor added Lee, F.
2024-02-19HouseAuthor added Becker-Finn
2024-02-15HouseAuthors added Pursell and Rehm
2024-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF3557 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Author added McEwen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback