MN HF3779 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Loonan.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Loonan.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employees granted the right to work without being required to become a member or pay fees to a labor organization, penalties and jurisdiction created, and other unfair labor practices provided.
Title
Employees granted the right to work without being required to become a member or pay fees to a labor organization, penalties and jurisdiction created, and other unfair labor practices provided.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Bob Loonan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Loonan. |
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Nornes. |
2018-03-22 | House | Author stricken McDonald. |
2018-03-21 | House | Authors added Green; Zerwas; Daniels; and Bahr, C. |
2018-03-15 | House | Authors added Lucero and Poston. |
2018-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3877 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy