MN HF377 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency responders training funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Emergency responders training funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Vang |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Bierman and Becker-Finn |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1158 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy