MN HF3753 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-30 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-30 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Environmental permit and review document demographic factor analysis required.
Title
Environmental permit and review document demographic factor analysis required.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | House | Author added Christensen |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3667 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance