MN HF3736 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Author added Mariani
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Author added Mariani
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Network for the Development of Children of African Descent program grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Network for the Development of Children of African Descent program grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Mariani |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Bennett |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4037 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy