MN HF3732 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author stricken O'Neill
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Author stricken O'Neill
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Labor agreements and compensation plan ratified.
Title
Labor agreements and compensation plan ratified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | Author stricken O'Neill |
2020-04-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance Division |
2020-03-12 | House | Author added Brand |
2020-03-05 | House | Author added Theis |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Klevorn |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF4006 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections