MN HF3729 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus tax bill.
Title
Omnibus tax bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-18 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-16 | House: Author added Loeffler | |
2010-05-15 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2010-05-15 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-15 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-15 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2010-05-15 | House: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-15 | House: Senate conferee change Senjem stricken; Rosen added | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: House adopted HCC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Senate conferee change Rosen replaced Senjem | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-10 | House: House conferees Lenczewski, Marquart, Koenen, Loeffler and Urdahl | |
2010-05-10 | House: Senate conferees Bakk, Skoe, Rest, Moua, Senjem | |
2010-05-10 | House: Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed | |
2010-05-10 | House: House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested | |
2010-05-10 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2010-05-10 | Senate: Senate conferees Bakk; Skoe; Rest; Moua; Senjem | |
2010-05-10 | Senate: House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested Lenczewski; Marquart; Koenen; Loffler; Urdahl | |
2010-05-10 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | Senate: Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed | |
2010-05-08 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. Calendar SF3327 | |
2010-05-08 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-05-07 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-05-07 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-05-07 | House: Point of order raised, ruled well taken | |
2010-05-07 | House: Amended | |
2010-05-07 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-05-07 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-05-07 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2010-05-06 | House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar | |
2010-05-05 | House: Second reading | |
2010-05-05 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-05-04 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2010-05-04 | House: Motion to lay on the table Minority Report | |
2010-05-04 | House: Minority report offered | |
2010-05-04 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | |
2010-03-22 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |