MN HF372 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-17 - Referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-17 - Referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm notice of possession at the Capitol complex requirement amended.
Title
Firearm notice of possession at the Capitol complex requirement amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. David Dill [D] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Abigail Whelan [R] |
Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] |
Rep. Tim Sanders [R] | Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. Jim Newberger [R] | Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] |
Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 92 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-04-16 | House | Bill was passed vote: 92-38 |
2015-04-16 | House | Third reading |
2015-04-16 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2015-04-16 | House | Amendments offered |
2015-04-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 16, 2015 |
2015-03-16 | House | Author added Backer. |
2015-03-16 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-02-09 | House | Author added Metsa. |
2015-01-29 | House | Authors added Swedzinski, Franson, and Uglem. |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF953 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Referred to Judiciary