MN HF3718 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Author added Becker-Finn.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Author added Becker-Finn.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Students in alternative programs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Students in alternative programs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Author added Becker-Finn. |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Lee. |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3810 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Referred to E-12 Finance