MN HF3717 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - Author added Fischer
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - Author added Fischer
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Paul; Third Street/Kellogg Boulevard Bridge removal and replacement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Paul; Third Street/Kellogg Boulevard Bridge removal and replacement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | House | Author added Fischer |
2018-04-12 | House | Author added Ward. |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3226 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Referred to Capital Investment