MN HF3708 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Carbon reduction facility designation established for large electric generating facilities.
Title
Carbon reduction facility designation established for large electric generating facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Jim Newberger [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] |
Rep. Joyce Peppin [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] |
Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2018-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added McDonald and Heintzeman. |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Theis. |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3504 (Similar To) 2018-05-18 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 20, 2018