MN HF3699 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Midwife licensure established by nursing board, and criminal penalties provided.
Title
Midwife licensure established by nursing board, and criminal penalties provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Huot |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Moran and Freiberg |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-02-28 | House | Authors added Davnie and Olson, L. |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3323 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Author added Wiklund